+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On August 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0284
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 6, 2021
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Ram Villivalam
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 058-001-000
- Senate Concurs
- Passed Both Houses
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 28, 2021
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Greg Harris
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Health Care Licenses Committee; 007-000-000
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-001-000
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 15, 2021
- Second Reading
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021
- Do Pass Licensed Activities; 009-000-000
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 002
In provisions amending the Regulatory Sunset Act, provides for repeal of the Landscape Architecture Registration Act on January 1, 2027 (rather than January 1, 2032). Adds an immediate effective date.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- New Act -
- 5 ILCS 80/4.41 new -
- 70 ILCS 1205/8-50 -
- 70 ILCS 1505/26.10-4 -
- 225 ILCS 745/20 -
- 730 ILCS 5/5-5-5 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-5-5
- 5 ILCS 80/4.37 -