+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 2, 2019
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 010-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
- Do Pass as Amended Higher Education; 011-000-000
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Higher Education
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Higher Education
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Provides for an irrevocable and continuing appropriation from the General Revenue Fund to the Illinois Student Assistance Commission if moneys in the Illinois Prepaid Tuition Trust Fund are insufficient to cover contractual obligations (rather than if for any reason the General Assembly fails to make appropriations of amounts sufficient for the State to pay contractual obligations). Removes the irrevocable and continuing authority of the Comptroller and Treasurer to make the necessary transfers and disbursements.