+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0814
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 27, 2004
On June 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 4, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000
On April 27, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 22, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary and Secondary Education Committee; 015-000-000
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 031-024-000
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 2, 2004
- Second Reading
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Education
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Do Pass as Amended Education; 006-001-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 25, 2004
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Education
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Education
On January 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On January 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that grants shall be used and applied by schools to defray the costs and expenses of operating and maintaining classes in grades kindergarten through 3 with an average class size within a specific grade of no more than 20 pupils (instead of with a class size of no more than 20 pupils). Provides that if a school's facilities are inadequate to allow for this specified class size, then a school may use the grant funds for teacher aides instead.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2004: SB2135 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 04, 2004
March 25, 2004: SB2135 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 25, 2004
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor