+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On August 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0921
- Effective Date January 1, 2009
- Governor Approved
On June 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary Criminal Law; 008-000-000
On May 30, 2008 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Suzanne Bassi
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 094-018-002
On May 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01-May 31, 2008
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Millner
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary Criminal Law
On May 27, 2008 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On May 23, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2008
On May 20, 2008 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Suzanne Bassi
On May 19, 2008 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On May 15, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 012-001-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On May 9, 2008 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 23, 2008
On April 30, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2008
- Second Reading
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Millner
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2008
- Do Pass Judiciary Criminal Law; 010-000-000
On February 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Criminal Law
On February 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Millner
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 720 ILCS 5/31-6 - from Ch. 38, par. 31-6
- 730 ILCS 5/5-8A-4.1 -