+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On July 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0804
- Effective Date July 24, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 4, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-001-000
On April 27, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 22, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2004
On February 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2004
- Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 009-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary
- Postponed - Judiciary
On February 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
On January 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On January 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Edward Petka
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2004: SB2134 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 04, 2004
March 25, 2004: SB2134 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 25, 2004
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor