+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-1082
- Effective Date July 1, 2005
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 033-024-002
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Local Government; 006-004-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Local Government
- Second Reading - Standard Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 068-049-000
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01-November 17, 2004
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. James T. Meeks
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- Second Reading - Standard Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Elections and Campaign Reform Committee; 005-004-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elections and Campaign Reform Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Elections and Campaign Reform Committee
- Assigned to Elections and Campaign Reform Committee
- Third Reading - Passed; 032-025-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Meeks
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Local Government; 006-003-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Local Government
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Local Government
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James T. Meeks
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James T. Meeks
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Fiscal Note Filed from the State Board of Elections.
- Fiscal Note Requested by Sen. John O. Jones
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 25, 2004
- Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 006-004-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Local Government
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James T. Meeks
- Assigned to Local Government
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. James T. Meeks
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Election code. Creates a grace period for the acceptance by election authorities of voter registration between the close of regular registration and the 14th day before an election or primary. Applies permissively before January 1, 2005 and mandatorily on and after January 1, 2005. Effective immediately.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill. Corrects a typographical error.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Election code. Creates a grace period for the acceptance by election authorities of voter registration between the close of regular registration and the 14th day before an election or primary. Applies permissively before January 1, 2005 and mandatorily on and after January 1, 2005. Effective immediately.