+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On August 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 20, 2021
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0543
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-044-000
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 008-006-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Simmons
- Third Reading - Passed; 040-001-000
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Rights; 008-000-000
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Rights
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Human Rights; 008-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Rights
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Adds primary or preferred language to the statistical or demographic data that must be reported under the amendatory provisions. Removes provisions relating to the University of Illinois Hospital Act and the Hospital Licensing Act.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 10100HB2170enr, Sec. 20-15
- 110 ILCS 330/8.5 new
- 210 ILCS 85/6.28 new
+ − Votes (5)
May 27, 2021: SB2133 - Third Reading
May 12, 2021: SB2133 - Human Services
April 29, 2021: SB2133 - Third Reading
April 22, 2021: SFA0001 - Human Rights
April 15, 2021: SB2133 - Human Rights
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor