+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Executive- Liquor
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 235 ILCS 5/6-5 - from Ch. 43, par. 122
- 235 ILCS 5/6-9.5 new -
- 235 ILCS 5/6-9.10 new -
- 235 ILCS 5/6-9.15 new -
- 235 ILCS 5/6-9.20 new -
- 235 ILCS 5/6-9.25 new -
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor