+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As February 18, 2022
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- To Appropriations- Health
- Re-assigned to Appropriations
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 705 ILCS 505/8 - from Ch. 37, par. 439.8
- 705 ILCS 505/22 - from Ch. 37, par. 439.22
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor