+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On February 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Transportation
On January 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On November 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. James A. DeLeo
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 625 ILCS 5/18a-200 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 18a-200
- 625 ILCS 5/18a-300 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 18a-300
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor