+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
- Do Pass Pensions; 008-001-000
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Pensions
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Pensions
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Pensions
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 40 ILCS 5/8-173 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 8-173
- 30 ILCS 805/8.45 new -
+ − Vote
April 14, 2021: SB0212 - Pensions
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor