+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (57)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0715
- Effective Date July 12, 2004
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 030-027-000
- Verified
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Revenue; 006-004-000
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. James A. DeLeo
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. James A. DeLeo
- Correctional Note Filed - Corrections Budget and Impact Note filed as amended by House Amendment No. 1 from the Illinois Department of Corrections.
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Debbie DeFrancesco Halvorson
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01-May 6, 2004
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 077-039-001
- State Debt Impact Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- Pension Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- Sponsor Removed Rep. James D. Brosnahan
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Judicial Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Revenue Committee
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue Committee; 005-000-003
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Barack Obama
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10(e), January 11, 2005.
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; DeLeo
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Adopted Revenue; 010-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James A. DeLeo
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2004
- Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 009-000-000
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James A. DeLeo
- To Subcommittee
- Assigned to Revenue
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. James A. DeLeo
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2
Amends the Senior Citizens Homestead Exemption provisions of the Property Tax Code. Provides that, in all counties (now, in counties with less than 3,000,000 inhabitants), the county board may by resolution provide that, if a person has been granted a homestead exemption, the person qualifying need not reapply for the exemption.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything. Amends the Senior Citizens Assessment Freeze Homestead Exemption provisions in the Property Tax Code. Increases the ceiling for household income eligibility, for taxable years 2003 and thereafter, from $40,000 per year to $45,000 per year. Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, in any county, if the assessed valuation of property has increased by more than 20% over the previous assessed valuation of that property, an additional general exemption is allowed, with the amount determined by household income. Provides that in all counties (now, in counties with more than 3,000,000 inhabitants), the assessor or chief county assessment officer may use specified methods to determine the eligibility of residential property to receive the homestead exemption and the amount of the exemption. Requires a taxpayer applying for the additional general homestead exemption to submit an application and an affidavit to the chief county assessment officer. Requires the Department of Revenue to issue guidelines establishing a method for verifying the accuracy of the affidavits. Requires the applications to be clearly marked as applications for the additional general homestead exemption. In provisions that authorize a partial exemption from property taxes for homestead properties that have been improved and residential structures on homestead property that have been rebuilt following a catastrophic event, changes the limit to $75,000 per year for that homestead property beginning January 1, 2004 and thereafter (now, $45,000 per year). Amends the Senior Citizens Assessment Freeze Homestead Exemption provisions and the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement from the State. Effective immediately.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2
Amends the Senior Citizens Homestead Exemption provisions of the Property Tax Code. Provides that, in all counties (now, in counties with less than 3,000,000 inhabitants), the county board may by resolution provide that, if a person has been granted a homestead exemption, the person qualifying need not reapply for the exemption.