+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On March 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On March 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On March 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 305 ILCS 5/10-17.7 -
- 410 ILCS 535/12 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 73-12
- 750 ILCS 45/5 - from Ch. 40, par. 2505
- 750 ILCS 45/6 - from Ch. 40, par. 2506
- 750 ILCS 45/7 - from Ch. 40, par. 2507
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor