+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On August 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0442
- Effective Date January 1, 2020
- Governor Approved
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 069-045-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Removed from Short Debate Status
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-005-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
- First Reading
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 037-017-000
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019
- Second Reading
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
- Do Pass as Amended Executive; 013-005-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Executive
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
- Assigned to Executive
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the introduced bill with the following changes: In provisions amending the Election Code, removes language that requires a refusal by an eligible voter to participate in the voting process to be documented by the voter or witnessed by a pollwatcher. Removes language that prohibits active law enforcement officers, employees of the Department of Corrections, or employees of the head sheriff of the facility where voting occurs from being election judges in a temporary branch polling place in a county jail.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 10 ILCS 5/19-2.3 new -
- 10 ILCS 5/19A-20 -
- 55 ILCS 5/3-15003.3 new -
- 55 ILCS 5/3-15003.4 new -
- 730 ILCS 5/3-2-2.3 new -
- 730 ILCS 5/3-14-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-14-1
+ − Votes (5)
May 28, 2019: SB2090 - Third Reading
May 23, 2019: SB2090 - Executive
April 10, 2019: SB2090 - Third Reading
March 20, 2019: SB2090 - Executive
March 20, 2019: SCA0001 - Executive
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor