+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0384
- Effective Date January 1, 2016
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 014-000-000
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Raoul
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
- Arrived in House
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that it is a mitigating factor in sentencing that at the time of the offense, the defendant is or had been the victim of domestic violence and the effects of the domestic violence tended to excuse or justify the defendant's criminal conduct. Defines "domestic violence". Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that a movant may present a meritorious claim for relief from a final order or judgment if the allegations in the petition establish each of the following by a preponderance of the evidence: (1) the movant was convicted of a forcible felony; (2) the movant's participation in the offense was related to him or her previously having been a victim of domestic violence as perpetrated by an intimate partner; (3) no evidence of domestic violence against the movant was presented at the movant's sentencing hearing; (4)the movant was unaware of the mitigating nature of the evidence of the domestic violence at the time of sentencing and could not have learned of its significance sooner through diligence; and (5) the new evidence of domestic violence against the movant is material and noncumulative to other evidence offered at the sentencing hearing, and is of such a conclusive character that it would likely change the sentence imposed by the original trial court. Defines "domestic violence", "forcible felony", and "intimate partner".
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 720 ILCS 5/2-5 - from Ch. 38, par. 2-5
- 720 ILCS 5/2-5 -
- 730 ILCS 5/5-5-3.1 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-5-3.1
- 735 ILCS 5/2-1401 - from Ch. 110, par. 2-1401