+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
- Postponed - Education
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
- Postponed - Education
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
- Postponed - Education
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/34-1 - from Ch. 122, par. 34-1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor