+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 3, 2009
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- To Executive Subcommittee on Ethics
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Duffy
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor