+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- To
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Government Accountability and Ethics
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 40 ILCS 5/1-160 -
- 40 ILCS 5/14-110 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 14-110