+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On October 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Total Veto Stands
On October 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed Calendar Total Veto October 3, 2007
On August 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Governor Vetoed
On June 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 22, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-018-000
On May 21, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On March 28, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On March 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On March 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2007
- Second Reading
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2007
- Do Pass as Amended Commerce and Economic Development; 010-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
On March 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Commerce and Economic Development
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Commerce and Economic Development
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Commerce and Economic Development
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
On February 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2007: SB0208 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 22, 2007
March 27, 2007: SB0208 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 27, 2007
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor