+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 21, 2021
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Education; 012-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
April 13, 2021: SFA0001 - Education
March 23, 2021: SB2071 - Education
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor