+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2013
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Assignments
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2013
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013
- Second Reading
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013
- Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno
+ − Statute Amended
- 55 ILCS 5/1-1001 - from Ch. 34, par. 1-1001
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor