+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On August 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
- Second Reading
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2017
- Do Pass Government Reform; 009-000-000
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Government Reform
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 8, 2017: SB2059 - Government Reform
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor