+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed-Local Government
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed-Local Government
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Local Policies
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Local Policies
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Local Government
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor