+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Special Issues (IN)
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Insurance
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy