+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (45)
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - January 10, 2017
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 063-049-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; 007-004-000
On May 30, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 067-048-000
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
On May 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
On May 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon
- Recalled to Second Reading
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2016
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On October 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Second Reading
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading July 15, 2015
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends Public Act 99-524 by adding and changing various appropriations. Also amends Public Act 99-524 by repealing language providing that certain appropriations are for costs incurred through December 31, 2016. Effective immediately.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Appropriates $2 to the Illinois Student Assistance Commission. Effective July 1, 2016.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends Public Act 99-409 by changing the amount of an appropriation to the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity. Makes appropriations to the Illinois Student Assistance Commission and the Court of Claims for specified purposes. Effective immediately.
+ − Votes (4)
January 9, 2017: SB2051 - Third Reading
May 31, 2016: SB2051 - Executive
May 31, 2016: HCA0001 - Executive
May 26, 2016: SB2051 - Third Reading
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor