+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 069-046-000
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Forby
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Recalled to Second Reading
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2016
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On October 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Second Reading
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading July 15, 2015
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Capital Development Board for its FY17 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2016.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Makes reappropriations to the Capital Development Board, the Illinois State Board of Education, and the Secretary of State. Provides that the appropriation authority granted in the Act is valid for costs incurred before July 1, 2016. Effective immediately.
+ − Votes (2)
May 26, 2016: SB2049 - Executive
May 24, 2016: SB2049 - Third Reading
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor