+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (46)
- Total Veto Stands
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Placed Calendar Total Veto
- Governor Vetoed
- Sent to the Governor
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - April 13, 2016
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 038-017-000
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-042-003
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 006-003-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Steans
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Senator Hunter added as co-sponsor
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Third Reading - Passed; 036-019-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading July 1, 2015
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 28, 2015
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Makes appropriations and reappropriations to various State agencies and educational institutions for specified purposes. Provides that all appropriation authority granted in the Act shall be used only for costs for services for which spending authority has not been authorized for fiscal year 2016 by any order of any court. Provides that the appropriation authority granted in the Act shall be valid for costs incurred prior to July 1, 2016. Effective immediately.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Makes appropriations to the Department of Public Health, the American Lung Association, the Department on Aging, the Department of Human Services, the Department of Healthcare and Family Services, the Department of Veterans' Affairs, the Court of Claims, the Department of Transportation, and the Department of the Lottery. Effective immediately.