+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (74)
- Total Veto Stands
- Override Governor Veto - House Lost 069-048-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Kelly M. Burke
- Placed on Calendar Total Veto March 2, 2016
- Arrived in House
- Override Governor Veto - Senate Passed 037-017-002
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Placed Calendar Total Veto March 2, 2016
- Governor Vetoed
- Sent to the Governor
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 009-003-004
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Andrew F Skoog
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-042-006
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - January 28, 2016
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Anthony DeLuca
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 036-012-003
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 036-012-003
- Senate Concurs
- Passed Both Houses
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Anthony DeLuca
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 006-004-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Kotowski
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-000-005
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Senator McGuire added as Chief Co-Sponsor
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Third Reading - Passed; 037-000-014
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Dan Kotowski
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading July 1, 2015
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 28, 2015
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Makes an appropriation to the Illinois Student Assistance Commission for grant awards to students eligible for the Monetary Award Program and for agency administrative and operational costs not to exceed 2% of the total appropriation. Makes appropriations to the Illinois Community College Board for: distribution of base operating and equalization grants to qualifying public community colleges and the City Colleges of Chicago for educational related expenses; career and technical education activities; and adult education and literacy activities. Provides that the appropriation authority is valid only for costs incurred from July 1, 2015 through June 30, 2016. Effective immediately.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Illinois Student Assistance Commission for its FY16 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective immediately.
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Makes an appropriation to the Illinois Student Assistance Commission from the General Revenue Fund for grant awards to students eligible for the Monetary Award Program and for agency administrative and operational costs. Effective immediately.