+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (77)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Total Veto Stands
On November 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed Calendar Total Veto November 16, 2016
On July 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Vetoed
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-003
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 020-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Motion - Move to Previous Question Rep. Ron Sandack
- Motion Prevailed
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 17, 2016
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Fred Crespo
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016
On January 3, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016
On August 12, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo
On July 8, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On May 31, 2015 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Assignments Refers to Appropriations I
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommend Do Adopt Appropriations I; 012-002-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted; J. Cullerton
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-003-000
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Pat McGuire
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Lost; 000-039-020
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Lost; 000-038-021
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 28, 2015
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Lost; 000-038-021
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Lost; 000-039-020
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Heather A. Steans
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2015
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendments (8)
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Makes appropriations and reappropriations to various State agencies for specified purposes. Provides that all appropriation authority granted in the Act shall be used only for costs for services for which spending authority has not been authorized for fiscal year 2016 by any order of any court. Provides that the appropriation authority granted in the Act is valid for costs incurred prior to July 1, 2016. Effective immediately.
Senate Amendment 005
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends Public Act 98-679, Public Act 98-680, and Public Act 98-681 by adding certain FY15 appropriations. Effective immediately.
+ − Votes (10)
May 12, 2016: SB2038 - Third Reading
May 12, 2016: HFA0002 - Concurrence
May 11, 2016: HFA0002 - Appropriations-Human Services
July 8, 2015: SB2038 - Executive - Jul 08, 2015
May 29, 2015: SFA0005 - Appropriations I - May 29, 2015
May 29, 2015: SB2038 - Third Reading - Friday, May 29, 2015
May 27, 2015: SFA0001 - Amendment - Wednesday, May 27, 2015
May 27, 2015: SFA0003 - Amendment - Wednesday, May 27, 2015
May 27, 2015: SFA0002 - Amendment - Wednesday, May 27, 2015
May 27, 2015: SFA0004 - Amendment - Wednesday, May 27, 2015
+ − Sponsors (54)
Type:
Primary Sponsor