+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Executive
On March 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 3, 2009
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- To Executive Subcommittee on State And Local Government
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- 30 ILCS 105/5.719 new -
- 30 ILCS 105/6z-76 new -
- 30 ILCS 105/8.3 - from Ch. 127, par. 144.3
- 35 ILCS 5/201 - from Ch. 120, par. 2-201
- 35 ILCS 5/202.5 new -
- 35 ILCS 5/901 - from Ch. 120, par. 9-901
- 625 ILCS 5/15-111 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 15-111
- 625 ILCS 5/15-112 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 15-112
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor