+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On July 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Total Veto Stands
On July 15, 2015 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Override Governor Veto - Senate Passed 039-015-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
On July 15, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Total Veto July 15, 2015
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. John J. Cullerton
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed Calendar Total Veto July 1, 2015
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Vetoed
On June 22, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 065-050-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
- Motion Prevailed 069-045-000
- Rep. Ron Sandack Object to the Motion, requests a Roll Call
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Appropriations-Public Safety Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Do Pass / Standard Debate Appropriations-Public Safety Committee; 014-010-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
- Second Reading - Standard Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 033-024-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; J. Cullerton
- Recalled to Second Reading
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Appropriations I; 009-005-000
On May 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations I
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2015
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Makes FY16 appropriations to various entities for specified purposes. Effective July 1, 2015.