+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On December 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Tort Reform
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor