+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On August 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0643
- Effective Date January 1, 2010
- Governor Approved
On June 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000
On May 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Criminal Law
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Millner
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 22, 2009
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On April 3, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On March 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009
- Second Reading
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Millner
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Changes the new eavesdropping exemption. Provides that any law enforcement officer or individual acting on behalf of a law enforcement officer may use an eavesdropping camera or audio device during an ongoing hostage or barricade situation when the use of such devices is necessary to protect the safety of the general public, hostages, or law enforcement officers or anyone acting on their behalf.