+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01-May 30, 2008
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
On May 28, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 068-045-000
On May 23, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2008
On May 14, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 13, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Gaming Committee; 015-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Gaming Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Gaming Committee
On May 9, 2008 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 23, 2008
On April 30, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Gaming Committee
On April 8, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 046-002-000
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2008
- Second Reading
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 11, 2008
- Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000
On February 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that there is no rulemaking authority under the amendatory Act, but that the Governor may suggest rules by filing them with the General Assembly and requesting that the General Assembly authorize such rulemaking by law, enact the suggested rules into law, or take other appropriate action in the General Assembly's discretion.