+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 31, 2018 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 25, 2018 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
- Arrived in House
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Do Pass Revenue; 006-000-000
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-assigned to Revenue
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie
+ − Statute Amended
- 35 ILCS 5/203 - from Ch. 120, par. 2-203
+ − Votes (2)
April 26, 2018: SB2017 - Third Reading
April 25, 2018: SB2017 - Revenue
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor