+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On December 1, 2009 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On September 30, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2009
On May 31, 2009 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2009
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 29, 2009
On May 8, 2009 in the House:
- Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2009
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On April 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 048-008-001
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009
- Second Reading
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009
- Do Pass Pensions and Investments; 007-000-002
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Pensions and Investments
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 40 ILCS 5/3-127 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 3-127
- 40 ILCS 5/4-118 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 4-118