+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Pensions and Investments
On February 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor