+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 1, 2014
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2014
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Assignments
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013
- Second Reading
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013
- Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno
+ − Statute Amended
- 5 ILCS 375/1 - from Ch. 127, par. 521
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor