+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Held in Human Services
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
On March 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Shane Cultra
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Human Services
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Shane Cultra
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with provisions identical to the bill except it deletes provisions that provide that placement when practicable shall be made to an agency under the control of persons of the same religious faith as that of the child or in the custody of someone of the same religious faith as that of the child. Makes corresponding changes.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 225 ILCS 10/2.08 - from Ch. 23, par. 2212.08
- 750 ILCS 50/4.1 - from Ch. 40, par. 1506
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor