+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Executive- Elections
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor