+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0953
- Effective Date January 1, 2009
- Governor Approved
On June 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 29, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
On May 28, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 27, 2008 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 007-000-000
On May 23, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2008
On May 19, 2008 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 23, 2008
- Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2008
- Second Reading
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 11, 2008
- Do Pass Agriculture and Conservation; 008-000-000
On February 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation
On February 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 505 ILCS 130/3 - from Ch. 5, par. 553
- 505 ILCS 130/16 - from Ch. 5, par. 566
+ − Votes (2)
May 29, 2008: SB1984 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 29, 2008
April 1, 2008: SB1984 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 01, 2008
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor