+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Appropriations- Revenue and Finance
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Appropriations- Revenue and Finance
- Assigned to Appropriations
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor