+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On August 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 008-002-001
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
- Second Reading
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
- Do Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 008-004-000
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Commerce and Economic Development
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 520 ILCS 5/2.30 - from Ch. 61, par. 2.30
- 520 ILCS 5/2.30b -
- 520 ILCS 5/2.30c -