+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (71)
- Session Sine Die
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 4, 6 - May 30, 2012
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 4, 6
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 007-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2012
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-000-003
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Withdrawn by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Roger L. Eddy
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Roger L. Eddy
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Roger L. Eddy
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Roger L. Eddy
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Roger L. Eddy
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Roger L. Eddy
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
- Third Reading - Consideration Postponed
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Pension Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Pension Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Roger L. Eddy
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Roger L. Eddy
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2011
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Cunningham
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 010-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Cunningham
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Cunningham
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2011
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2011
- Do Pass Higher Education; 010-000-000
- Assigned to Higher Education
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Edward D. Maloney
+ − Adopted Amendments (6)
House Floor Amendment No. 4
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the engrossed bill and the following changes. Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Adds and excludes certain classes of persons from the definition of "community college benefit recipient". Provides, beginning July 1, 2012, (i) that the program of health benefits for community college benefit recipients and community college dependent beneficiaries shall include health benefits for community college benefit recipients and community college dependent beneficiaries subject to the City Colleges of Chicago Article of the Public Community College Act and (ii) that those persons and the employers of those persons shall pay the required contributions. Provides that a community college district subject to the City Colleges of Chicago Article of the Public Community College Act shall contribute (i) $7,800,000 toward the cost of these health benefits by March 30, 2012 and (ii) an additional amount on or before September 1, 2012. Establishes the Community College Fiscal Board, and requires it to make an annual assessment of the funding levels of the Community College Health Insurance Security Fund and to submit a report containing related information to the Commission on Government Forecasting and Accountability at least 90 days before the end of fiscal year 2011, or as soon thereafter as is possible, and, again, at least 90 days before the end of each subsequent fiscal year. Provides that, if the reported actuarial present value of projected benefits expected to be paid to community college benefit recipients and their dependents exceeds the actuarial present value of projected contributions and other income, then the report must provide a plan that will (i) be implemented over a period of not more than 5 years from each valuation date and (ii) make the actuarial present value of projected contributions and other income equal to or exceed the actuarial present value of projected benefits expected to be paid to community college benefit recipients and their dependents. Provides for review of the plan and reports by the Commission on Government Forecasting and Accountability. Changes the required employee and employer contributions to the Community College Health Insurance Security Fund. Amends the Public Community College Act. Provides that as of July 1, 2012, a community college district must maintain a minimum required combined in-district tuition and universal fee rate per semester credit hour equal to 70% (instead of 85%) of the State-average combined rate, as determined by the Illinois Community College Board, or the total revenue received by the community college district from combined in-district tuition and universal fees must be at least 30% of the total revenue received by the community college district, as determined by the Board, for equalization funding. Provides that the tuition rate and fee limit of 1/3 of the per capita cost applies until the effective date of the amendatory Act and beginning again 3 years after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 110 ILCS 805/3-27.1 - from Ch. 122, par. 103-27.1