+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- Re-assigned to Executive Committee
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
On June 1, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 2, 2003 in the House:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 31, 2003
On April 14, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On April 10, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On April 8, 2003 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On April 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10(e) to April 9, 2003.
On March 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Sen. Dale E. Risinger
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass State Government; 005-001-001
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg