+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On February 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-1107
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date February 16, 2007
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to State Government
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 051-000-000
- Passed Both Houses
On January 8, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On January 7, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 9, 2007
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 13, 2005 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 20, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On April 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-003-000
On April 13, 2005 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2005
- Second Reading
On March 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 15, 2005
- Do Pass State Government; 007-000-000
On March 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On February 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the State Property Control Act. Authorizes the administrator to sell all or part of the property in Cook County known as the John J. Madden Mental Health Center to Loyola University Medical Center if the property is declared not needed by the Secretary of Human Services. Requires the sale to be at fair market value determined by appraisals. Provides that the property may not be sold or leased to any other party without first offering it for sale to Loyola. Effective immediately.