+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On August 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0890
- Effective Date August 22, 2008
- Governor Approved
On June 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 30, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On May 28, 2008 in the House:
- Balanced Budget Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Thomas Holbrook
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 005-000-000
On May 23, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2008
On May 19, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 23, 2008
On May 7, 2008 in the House:
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
On May 6, 2008 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
- Pension Note Filed
- State Debt Impact Note Filed
On May 1, 2008 in the House:
- State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Thomas Holbrook
- Pension Note Requested by Rep. Thomas Holbrook
- Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Thomas Holbrook
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Thomas Holbrook
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Thomas Holbrook
On April 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-001
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 11, 2008
- Second Reading
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 26, 2008
- Do Pass Pensions and Investments; 010-000-000
On February 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Pensions and Investments
On February 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
+ − Statute Amended
- 40 ILCS 5/7-174 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 7-174