+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 14, 2008 in the House:
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Robert F. Flider
On May 8, 2008 in the House:
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Michael K. Smith
On May 7, 2008 in the House:
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Thomas Holbrook
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg
On May 6, 2008 in the House:
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
On April 24, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 17, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 033-020-001
On April 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2008
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Do Pass as Amended Education; 008-001-000
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Dan Cronin
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 1, 2008
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Education
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Held in Education
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Held in Education
On February 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On February 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the 5 additional charter schools may each contain up to 25 campuses.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
April 17, 2008: SB1956 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 17, 2008
+ − Sponsors (68)
Type:
Primary Sponsor