+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
On July 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On April 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10(e) to December 31, 2003.
On April 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10(e) to April 9, 2003.
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 19, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass Executive; 008-005-000
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Vince Demuzio
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/2-3.71 - from Ch. 122, par. 2-3.71
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor