+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On August 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0495
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 8, 2003
On June 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Adopted Executive; 013-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. M. Maggie Crotty
On May 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. M. Maggie Crotty
On May 30, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Julie Hamos
On May 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01 - May 31, 2003
On May 30, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-001-000
On May 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
On May 29, 2003 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Julie Hamos
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 31, 2003
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On May 2, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On March 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Verified
- Third Reading - Passed; 032-016-002
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 19, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass Executive; 008-005-000
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Vince Demuzio
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything. Creates the Children's Mental Health Act of 2003 and amends the State Finance Act and the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the State to develop a Children's Mental Health Plan containing short-term and long-term recommendations to provide comprehensive, coordinated mental health prevention, early intervention, and treatment services for children through age 18. Creates the Children's Mental Health Partnership to develop and monitor the implementation of the Plan and report to the Governor. Requires the Department of Public Aid and the Department of Human Services to take certain actions with respect to children's mental health services provided under Medicaid. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/2-3.64 - from Ch. 122, par. 2-3.64
+ − Votes (3)
May 31, 2003: HFA0001 - Concurrence - Saturday, May 31, 2003
May 30, 2003: SB1951 - Third Reading - Friday, May 30, 2003
March 27, 2003: SB1951 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 27, 2003
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor